+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 812, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2795.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2795.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pan.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2790.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 18).
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and JUD.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 945.) (May 2).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 27.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2017: Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2017: Unfinished Business SB550 Pan Concurrence Reconsider
- Yeas: 40
September 11, 2017: SB 550 Pan Senate Third Reading By RODRIGUEZ
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
June 21, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB550 Pan
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor