+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor