+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 2444.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 7. Page 2783.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1298.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: Unfinished Business SB549 Hall Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: SB 549 Hall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 9
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB549 Hall
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor