+ − Summaries (12)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 11).
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3189.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2786.)
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 10).
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Corrected September 10).
- Read third time and amended.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1307.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 723.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and RLS.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (13)
September 11, 2015: SB 548 De León Senate Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 4
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 6) SB548 De León Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 6) SB548 De León Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
September 11, 2015: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 8, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB548 De León
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor