+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1682.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2151.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 947.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 880.) (May 8).
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 8, 2013: Unfinished Business SB546 Wright Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 9
June 25, 2013: SB 546 Wright Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
June 12, 2013: Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SB546 Wright
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor