+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2351.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2243.)
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 23.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2170.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2634.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
On July 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1330.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 536.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB544
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 23, 2017: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 20, 2017: SB 544 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 12
July 12, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB544 McGuire
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor