+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2838.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 1152.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 10).
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 3, 2013: SB 535 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 14, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 2, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB535 Nielsen
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor