+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2707.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2697.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19).
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1).
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1018.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB533 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 12
August 31, 2015: SB 533 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
August 19, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 9
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 9
May 18, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB533 Pan
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor