+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 317, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2015: Special Consent #9 SB532 Leyva
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: SB 532 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 27, 2015: SB 532 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB532 Leyva
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor