+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 744.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 598.) (April 8).
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 331.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 12.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10.
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
April 22, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB53 Wilk et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
April 8, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
March 12, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor