+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Stone
Type:
Primary Sponsor