+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 2. Page 854.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2017: [Second] hearing set for [04-26-2017]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor