+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 5347.)
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 11).
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 hearing postponed by committee.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 6).
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & E. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1332.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1195.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 955.) (April 28).
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 671.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and HEALTH.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, L., P.E. & R., and JUD.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (9)
+ − Votes (11)
August 31, 2022: Unfinished Business SB523 Leyva et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
August 30, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2022: SB 523 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB523 Leyva et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1