+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- January 11 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Set for hearing January 11.
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor