+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 12).
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & E.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1186.) (May 25).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 621.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 12, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
June 1, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB520 Mitchell
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 4, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor