+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2565.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On June 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- June 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.M.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
September 1, 2021: Unfinished Business SB52 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2021: SB 52 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
July 5, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB52 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor