+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 441.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
March 26, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor