+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2769.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On July 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1186.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 514.) (March 28).
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB513
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2017: SB 513 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 19, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB513 Bradford
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor