+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 24. Page 2849.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 668.) (April 23).
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB510 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
September 3, 2013: SB 510 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 13
June 19, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 2, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB510 Jackson
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1