+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 729, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 2611.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 3014.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2781.)
- Reconsideration granted.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 47. Noes 18. Page 2750.)
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 13).
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- July 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1194.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 704.) (April 7).
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB510 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
September 9, 2021: SB 510 Pan Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 8
September 3, 2021: SB 510 Pan Third Reading Urgency By Aguiar-Curry Amend By AGUIAR-CURRY Set #1
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2021: SB 510 Pan Third Reading Urgency By Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 14
August 26, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
July 13, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB510 Pan Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor