+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2021.
On July 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1982.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 2313.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Action rescinded whereby bill Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 18).
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 156.) (February 4).
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 4.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 130.) (February 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 1.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
July 15, 2021: Unfinished Business SB51 Durazo et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
July 12, 2021: SB 51 Durazo Third Reading Urgency By Carrillo
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 6
March 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB51 Durazo et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 7
February 4, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor