+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1993.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1919.)
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
June 14, 2013: SB 509 DeSaulnier Third Reading Urgency By COOLEY
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB509 DeSaulnier Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor