+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2212.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2476.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1194.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 687.) (April 6).
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 605.) (March 24).
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH, JUD., and APPR.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2021: Unfinished Business SB507 Eggman et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2021: SB 507 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Quirk-Silva
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 15
May 28, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB507 Eggman et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 11