+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and JUD.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 968.) (May 6).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 799.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 524.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
July 11, 2019: SB 506 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
June 12, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB506 Hueso
- Yeas: 38
May 6, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor