+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2433.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 836.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 508.) (April 7).
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
July 16, 2015: SB 502 Leno Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 16, 2015: SB 502 Leno Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
June 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
April 30, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB502 Leno
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor