+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- July 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1252.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 16).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3).
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB499 McGuire et al.
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
April 29, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7