+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 789.) Reconsideration granted.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
May 1, 2013: Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor