+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 684, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2424.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3193.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2955.)
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 13).
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1167.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 697.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Business SB494 Monning Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2013: SB 494 Monning Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL
- Yeas: 78
August 13, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB494 Monning
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 24, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor