+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on the inactive file.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 24).
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 734.) (April 29).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB492 Hernandez
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 9
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor