+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1163.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1006.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 694.) (April 24).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2013: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB49 Lieu
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 24, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9