+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 419, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2628.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 881.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 27).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 649.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 1, 2015: Special Consent #9 SB489 Monning
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: SB 489 Monning Senate Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB489 Monning
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
April 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor