+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 89, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2290.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 791.) (May 1).
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2013: Unfinished Business SB488 Hueso Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 6
July 3, 2013: SB 488 Hueso Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 13, 2013: Special Consent #4 SB488 Hueso
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor