+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 664.) (April 24).
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and INS.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 24, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Insurance.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor