+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 15 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 15.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor