+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 917, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4924.)
- Set for hearing August 27.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6415.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 5108.)
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and TRANS.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1105.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1015.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 759.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and T. & H.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (12)
August 28, 2014: Unfinished Business SB486 DeSaulnier Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 27, 2014: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
August 25, 2014: SB 486 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL
- Yeas: 79
June 23, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
August 14, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
August 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB486 DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor