+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (49)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on the inactive file.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On August 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 27 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
On June 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2795.) (January 20).
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 20.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- January 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 18.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2727.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- (Corrected January 6).
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
On January 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On December 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 6 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Portantino.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1193.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1045.) (May 6).
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 7
January 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB485 Portantino et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
January 20, 2022: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 7
January 6, 2022: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor