+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 803.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 746.) (April 18).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 18.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB484 Roth
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor