+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 708, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5533.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6235.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5950.)
On August 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1033.) (May 18).
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 794.) (April 27).
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2016: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 1) SB482 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
August 24, 2016: SB 482 Lara Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 80
August 19, 2016: SB 482 Lara Senate Third Reading By A & A.R. Amendment Set #1
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
June 14, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
May 19, 2016: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 11
May 28, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB482 Lara
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor