+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 564.) Ordered to the Senate.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 3.) (March 2).
On February 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 219.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4. Page 172.) (February 9).
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 162.) (February 6). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 9 in B. & F.R. pending receipt.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and B. & F.R.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 6 in P.E. & R. pending receipt.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2017: SB 48 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
February 17, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Committee On B. & F.R. (Mitchell)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
February 9, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Budget and Fiscal Review ]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Budget andtitle="No Votes Recorded">No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor