+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2544.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 2538.)
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing September 8.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1416.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 405.) (March 8).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 8.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB48 Limón et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
September 8, 2021: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2021: SB 48 Limón Senate Third Reading By Nazarian
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
June 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Limón et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor