+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On September 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Gloria.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On July 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1002.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 906.) (April 30).
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 31, 2020: SB 479 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Gloria
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 26, 2020: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 12
May 9, 2019: Consent Calendar SB479
- Yeas: 38
April 30, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor