+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2443.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1154.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
September 3, 2015: Unfinished Business SB478 Huff Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: SB 478 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: SB 478 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 26, 2015: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB478 Huff
- Yeas: 40
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
April 27, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor