+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1327.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1185.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
July 10, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB477 Cannella et al.
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense fileVotes Recorded">No Votes Recorded:
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13