+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 610, Statutes of 2023.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2744.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 3275.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 3010.)
On September 5, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1).
On July 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 31, 2023 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1171.) (May 18).
On May 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On April 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- April 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 473.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 13, 2023: Unfinished Business SB476 Limón et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
September 12, 2023: SB 476 Limón Senate Third Reading By Friedman
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 6
June 20, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2023: Senate 3rd Reading SB476 Limón et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2023: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 10, 2023: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2023: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1