+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 18, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB470 Skinner
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
May 6, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor