+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 161, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1984.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2359.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden.
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 14).
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 16, 2015: Unfinished Business SB470 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 13, 2015: SB 470 Jackson Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
April 27, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SB470 Jackson
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 4
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor