+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 238, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 2884.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 776.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB47 Limón et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
September 8, 2021: SB 47 Limón Senate Third Reading By Bennett
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 7
July 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB47 Limón
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1