+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2888.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 3433.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 14).
- Coauthors revised.
On July 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1185.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2019: Unfinished Business SB47 Allen et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
September 11, 2019: SB 47 Allen Senate Third Reading By Mullin
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
August 14, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
July 3, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB47 Allen
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1