+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1149.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
On December 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 18.
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Special Order SB47 Yee
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 6, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 16, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2