+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On June 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2621.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On December 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 14.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H., GOV. & F., and APPR.
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2014: Special Consent #18 SB469 Corbett
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 23, 2014: SB 469 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 16, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SB469 Corbett
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
January 14, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor